NJ A6093 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S296
Note: Carry Foward to future A1278
Note: Carry Foward to future A1278
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.478.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.478.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Mandates periodic cancer screening examinations for firefighters enrolled in SHBP.
Title
Mandates periodic cancer screening examinations for firefighters enrolled in SHBP.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S4201 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-09 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S4201 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-09 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-18 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.478. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Substituted for S4201 (1R) |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (80-0-0) |
2022-01-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-12-09 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2021-11-15 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A6093 (Carry Over) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.478.
A6093 (Carry Over) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.478.
S4201 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A6093 (1R)
A6093 (Carry Over) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.478.
S4201 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A6093 (1R)