NJ S4139 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on January 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Makes Fiscal Year 2020 supplemental appropriation of $250,000 to Rutgers University - New Brunswick for School of Dental Medicine - Special Care Treatment Center.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes Fiscal Year 2020 supplemental appropriation of $250,000 to Rutgers University - New Brunswick for School of Dental Medicine - Special Care Treatment Center.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5751 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 6 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-13AssemblyAbsolute Veto, Received in the Senate
2019-12-16SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (34-4)
2019-12-16SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2019-12-16AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (61-6-0)
2019-12-16AssemblySubstituted for A5751 (1R)
2019-12-16AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Benson)
2019-12-16AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2019-12-16SenatePassed by the Senate (36-4)
2019-11-18SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-10-24SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

A5751 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S4139 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback