NJ A5751 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S4139 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Makes Fiscal Year 2020 supplemental appropriation of $250,000 to Rutgers University - New Brunswick for School of Dental Medicine - Special Care Treatment Center.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes Fiscal Year 2020 supplemental appropriation of $250,000 to Rutgers University - New Brunswick for School of Dental Medicine - Special Care Treatment Center.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-16AssemblySubstituted by S4139 (1R)
2019-12-05AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-08-23AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

S4139 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback