NJ S3945 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on December 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-19 - Approved P.L.2019, c.272.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

"Create a Respectful and Open Workspace for Natural Hair Act"- CROWN Act; addresses discrimination under "Law Against Discrimination." based on traits historically associated with race, particularly focused on hair texture and style.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Create a Respectful and Open Workspace for Natural Hair Act"- CROWN Act; addresses discrimination under "Law Against Discrimination." based on traits historically associated with race, particularly focused on hair texture and style.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5564 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-19AssemblyApproved P.L.2019, c.272.
2019-12-16AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (71-1-0)
2019-12-16AssemblySubstituted for A5564 (1R)
2019-12-16AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2019-12-16SenatePassed by the Senate (38-1)
2019-11-18SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-09-10SenateTransferred to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-06-13SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee

Same As/Similar To

A5564 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S3945 (1R)
S3945 (Same As) 2019-12-19 - Approved P.L.2019, c.272.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback