NJ A5564 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on June 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S3945 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S3945 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
" Create a Respectful and Open Workspace for Natural Hair Act"- CROWN Act; addresses discrimination under "Law Against Discrimination." based on traits historically associated with race, particularly focused on hair texture and style.*
Title
" Create a Respectful and Open Workspace for Natural Hair Act"- CROWN Act; addresses discrimination under "Law Against Discrimination." based on traits historically associated with race, particularly focused on hair texture and style.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-09 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Substituted by S3945 (1R) |
2019-12-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3945 (Same As) 2019-12-19 - Approved P.L.2019, c.272.