NJ S3939 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3-1)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.439.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes Recycling Market Development Council.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes Recycling Market Development Council.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5681 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-21AssemblyApproved P.L.2019, c.439.
2020-01-13AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-0)
2020-01-13AssemblySubstituted for A5681/5682 (ACS/1R)
2020-01-09AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2020-01-09SenatePassed by the Senate (39-0)
2019-12-16SenateSenate Amendment (28-0) (Smith)
2019-11-18SenateReported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2019-06-13SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee

Same As/Similar To

A5682 (Same As) 2019-12-09 - Combined with A5681 (ACS)
A5681 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S3939/3944 (SCS/1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback