NJ A5681 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S91
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on June 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S3939/3944 (SCS/1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S3939/3944 (SCS/1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Recycling Market Development Council.*
Title
Establishes Recycling Market Development Council.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-09 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted by S3939/3944 (SCS/1R) |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Pinkin) |
2019-12-09 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-24 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5681 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S3939/3944 (SCS/1R)
S3944 (Same As) 2019-11-18 - Combined with S3939 (SCS)
S3939 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.439.
S3944 (Same As) 2019-11-18 - Combined with S3939 (SCS)
S3939 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.439.