NJ S3887 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1543
Note: Carry Foward to future S1340
Note: Carry Over of previous A5825
Note: Carry Over of previous S4268
Note: Carry Foward to future S1340
Note: Carry Over of previous A5825
Note: Carry Over of previous S4268
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires cable television, direct broadcast satellite, and television streaming service companies to include certain fees and charges for service in advertised price to consumers.
Title
Requires cable television, direct broadcast satellite, and television streaming service companies to include certain fees and charges for service in advertised price to consumers.
Sponsors
Sen. James Beach [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3887 (Carry Over) 2021-06-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
S3887 (Carry Over) 2021-06-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A2339 (Same As) 2020-03-05 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A5825 (Carry Over) 2020-01-06 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
S4268 (Carry Over) 2019-12-12 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S3887 (Carry Over) 2021-06-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A2339 (Same As) 2020-03-05 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A5825 (Carry Over) 2020-01-06 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
S4268 (Carry Over) 2019-12-12 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S3887 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S4000/3887_I1.HTM |