NJ S3780 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-24 - Approved P.L.2021, c.226.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-24 - Approved P.L.2021, c.226.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Permits prosecutors to enroll in Prosecutors Part of PERS.
Title
Permits prosecutors to enroll in Prosecutors Part of PERS.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Lagana [D] | Sen. Paul Sarlo [D] | Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Nicholas Sacco [D] |
Rep. Ralph Caputo [D] | Rep. Thomas Giblin [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 19 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5785 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5785 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-24 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.226. |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (55-19-0) |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Substituted for A5785 (1R) |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-3) |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5785 (Same As) 2021-06-24 - Substituted by S3780 (1R)