NJ S3586 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1740
Note: Carry Foward to future S1526
Note: Carry Over of previous A4424
Note: Carry Over of previous S3025
Note: Carry Foward to future S1526
Note: Carry Over of previous A4424
Note: Carry Over of previous S3025
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits counties and municipalities to bond for passenger cars and station wagons solely fueled by electric or renewable power sources.
Title
Permits counties and municipalities to bond for passenger cars and station wagons solely fueled by electric or renewable power sources.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3586 (Carry Over) 2021-03-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S3586 (Carry Over) 2021-03-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A2208 (Same As) 2022-01-04 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A4424 (Carry Over) 2018-09-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
S3025 (Carry Over) 2018-10-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S3586 (Carry Over) 2021-03-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A2208 (Same As) 2022-01-04 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A4424 (Carry Over) 2018-09-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
S3025 (Carry Over) 2018-10-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S3586 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S4000/3586_I1.HTM |