NJ S3504 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A4577

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Substituted by A3352 (ACS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires all newly constructed warehouses to be solar-ready buildings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires all newly constructed warehouses to be solar-ready buildings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-03SenateSubstituted by A3352 (ACS)
2021-05-11SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2021-03-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3352 (Same As) 2021-06-03 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (25-13)
A4577 (Carry Over) 2018-10-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback