NJ S3491 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-02 - Substituted by A5086
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-02 - Substituted by A5086
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases minimum monthly benefit under State SNAP Minimum Benefits Program from $50 to $95 and authorizes DHS to increase program benefit amount.
Title
Increases minimum monthly benefit under State SNAP Minimum Benefits Program from $50 to $95 and authorizes DHS to increase program benefit amount.
Sponsors
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Nilsa Cruz-Perez [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] |
Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Nia Gill [D] | Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] |
Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-01-26 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-02 | Senate | Substituted by A5086 |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5086 (Same As) 2023-02-08 - Approved P.L.2023, c.13.