NJ A5086 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on February 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-08 - Approved P.L.2023, c.13.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on February 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-08 - Approved P.L.2023, c.13.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Increases minimum monthly benefit under State SNAP Minimum Benefits Program from $50 to $95 and authorizes DHS to increase program benefit amount.
Title
Increases minimum monthly benefit under State SNAP Minimum Benefits Program from $50 to $95 and authorizes DHS to increase program benefit amount.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3491 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3491 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-08 | Senate | Approved P.L.2023, c.13. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Substituted for S3491 |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2023-01-26 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-5-0) |
2023-01-19 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2023-01-12 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3491 (Same As) 2023-02-02 - Substituted by A5086