NJ S3469 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1185
Note: Carry Foward to future S2073
Note: Carry Foward to future S2073
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Mandates training on remote teaching for all candidates for teaching certification.
Title
Mandates training on remote teaching for all candidates for teaching certification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-1) |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3469 (Carry Over) 2021-06-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S3469 (Carry Over) 2021-06-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A4859 (Same As) 2021-02-24 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S3469 (Carry Over) 2021-06-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A4859 (Same As) 2021-02-24 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee