NJ S3444 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-20 - Approved P.L.2023, c.116.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-20 - Approved P.L.2023, c.116.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Allows certain municipal water systems, under certain circumstances, to use lands preserved for recreation and conservation for drinking water wells and associated treatment equipment or facilities.
Title
Allows certain municipal water systems, under certain circumstances, to use lands preserved for recreation and conservation for drinking water wells and associated treatment equipment or facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5211 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-12 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5211 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-12 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-20 | Senate | Approved P.L.2023, c.116. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (73-0-0) |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | Substituted for A5211 (1R) |
2023-03-30 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Wimberly) |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2023-02-06 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5211 (Same As) 2023-05-25 - Substituted by S3444 (1R)