NJ A5211 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-25 - Substituted by S3444 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-25 - Substituted by S3444 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows certain municipal water systems, under certain circumstances, to use lands preserved for recreation and conservation for drinking water wells and associated treatment equipment or facilities.
Title
Allows certain municipal water systems, under certain circumstances, to use lands preserved for recreation and conservation for drinking water wells and associated treatment equipment or facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-25 | Assembly | Substituted by S3444 (1R) |
2023-03-30 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Wimberly) |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2023-02-23 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3444 (Same As) 2023-07-20 - Approved P.L.2023, c.116.