NJ S3442 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2242
Note: Carry Foward to future S1966
Note: Carry Foward to future S1966
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A5334 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A5334 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DOT, NJT, and DHS to study and implement transportation mobility and accessibility improvements for persons with autism and developmental disabilities.
Title
Requires DOT, NJT, and DHS to study and implement transportation mobility and accessibility improvements for persons with autism and developmental disabilities.
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Sen. Thomas Kean [R] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Sen. Joseph Lagana [D] |
Sen. Anthony M. Bucco [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | Substituted by A5334 (1R) |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3442 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A5334 (1R)
S3442 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A5334 (1R)
A5334 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
S3442 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A5334 (1R)
A5334 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session