NJ S3432 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-25 - Approved P.L.2024, c.49.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-25 - Approved P.L.2024, c.49.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Next New Jersey Program for artificial intelligence investments.
Title
Establishes Next New Jersey Program for artificial intelligence investments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 14 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4558 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 14 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4558 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-25 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2024, c.49. |
2024-06-28 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (60-14-0) |
2024-06-28 | Assembly | Substituted for A4558 |
2024-06-28 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2024-06-28 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2024-06-26 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2024-06-24 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2024-06-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4558 (Same As) 2024-06-28 - Substituted by S3432