NJ S3335 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S994
Note: Carry Foward to future A3329
Note: Carry Foward to future A3329
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-18 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-18 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires BPU to conduct study of effect of coronavirus 2019 pandemic on local and public utility service and to quarterly collect and publish certain local and public utility service and customer information.
Title
Requires BPU to conduct study of effect of coronavirus 2019 pandemic on local and public utility service and to quarterly collect and publish certain local and public utility service and customer information.
Sponsors
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Sen. Nilsa Cruz-Perez [D] | Sen. Steven Oroho [R] |
Sen. Joseph Pennacchio [R] | Sen. Anthony M. Bucco [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-03-15 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2021-01-29 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (32-0) |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3335 (Carry Over) 2021-05-18 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S3335 (Carry Over) 2021-05-18 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A5290 (Same As) 2021-05-18 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S3335 (Carry Over) 2021-05-18 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A5290 (Same As) 2021-05-18 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading