NJ S3309 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on January 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-20 - Approved P.L.2019, c.365.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes New Jersey Violence Intervention Program to fund violence reduction initiatives.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes New Jersey Violence Intervention Program to fund violence reduction initiatives.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4801 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-20SenateApproved P.L.2019, c.365.
2020-01-13SenatePassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-2)
2020-01-09SenateReceived in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend.
2020-01-09AssemblyPassed by the Senate (39-0)
2019-09-12Assembly2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (30-0)
2019-08-23AssemblyConditional Veto, Received in the Senate
2019-06-20SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0)
2019-06-20SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2019-06-20AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (74-0-3)
2019-06-20AssemblySubstituted for A4801 (2R)
2019-06-20AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Greenwald)
2019-06-20AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2019-06-20SenatePassed by the Senate (38-0)
2019-01-15SenateIntroduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading

Same As/Similar To

A4801 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S3309 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback