NJ S3307 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-20 - Approved P.L.2017, c.244.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-20 - Approved P.L.2017, c.244.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revises procedures for expunging criminal and other records and information, including shortening of certain waiting periods for expungement eligibility and increasing number of convictions which may be expunged.
Title
Revises procedures for expunging criminal and other records and information, including shortening of certain waiting periods for expungement eligibility and increasing number of convictions which may be expunged.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A5038 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-20 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2017, c.244. |
2017-12-07 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (61-1-0) |
2017-12-07 | Assembly | Substituted for A5038 (2R) |
2017-12-07 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (27-8) |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5038 (Same As) 2017-12-07 - Substituted by S3307 (1R)