NJ S3305 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (62-8-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (62-8-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises tax credit transfer provisions for certain tax incentive programs and revises certain tax treatment of tax credit transfer certificates.*
Title
Revises tax credit transfer provisions for certain tax incentive programs and revises certain tax treatment of tax credit transfer certificates.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A5035 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 8 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 8 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (62-8-0) |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Substituted for A5035 |
2017-12-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-12-14 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (33-0) |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5035 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S3305 (SCS)