NJ A5035 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1667
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on June 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S3305 (SCS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S3305 (SCS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises tax credit transfer provisions for certain tax incentive programs and revises certain tax treatment of tax credit transfer certificates.
Title
Revises tax credit transfer provisions for certain tax incentive programs and revises certain tax treatment of tax credit transfer certificates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Substituted by S3305 (SCS) |
2017-12-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-12-14 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5035 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S3305 (SCS)
S3305 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (62-8-0)
S3305 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (62-8-0)