NJ S3293 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3170
Note: Carry Over of previous A2942
Note: Carry Over of previous A2942
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on October 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-12-01 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-12-01 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes creation of Combat Action Ribbon license plate.
Title
Authorizes creation of Combat Action Ribbon license plate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-12-01 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-01 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-10-31 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3293 (Carry Over) 2022-12-01 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A3623 (Same As) 2022-03-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A2942 (Carry Over) 2020-02-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A3623 (Same As) 2022-03-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A2942 (Carry Over) 2020-02-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee