NJ S3289 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S341
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
Pending: Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
Pending: Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires electric public utility to replace certain distribution service equipment over period of 36 months if certain sustained service interruptions occur.
Title
Requires electric public utility to replace certain distribution service equipment over period of 36 months if certain sustained service interruptions occur.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3289 (Carry Over) 2021-06-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
A5876 (Same As) 2021-06-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
A5876 (Same As) 2021-06-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee