NJ S3263 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S2441
Note: Carry Foward to future A4151
Note: Carry Foward to future A4151
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Vetoed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revises and updates membership and purpose of Advisory Council on the Deaf and Hard of Hearing in DHS.
Title
Revises and updates membership and purpose of Advisory Council on the Deaf and Hard of Hearing in DHS.
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Kean [R] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Nicholas Chiaravalloti [D] |
Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Sen. Richard Codey [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4837 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4837 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Senate | Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Substituted for A4837 (2R) |
2019-11-25 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-0) |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3263 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
S3263 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
A4837 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S3263 (3R)
S3263 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
A4837 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S3263 (3R)