NJ S2441 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S3263

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 11 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-01-12 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Revises and updates membership and purpose of Advisory Council on the Deaf and Hard of Hearing in DHS.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises and updates membership and purpose of Advisory Council on the Deaf and Hard of Hearing in DHS.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-07 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-12AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
2021-01-11SenatePassed by the Senate (34-0)
2020-12-07SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-05-07SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3263 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
A4151 (Same As) 2020-05-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback