NJ S3244 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 11 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 11 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates school district budget per pupil administrative cost limits.
Title
Eliminates school district budget per pupil administrative cost limits.
Sponsors
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Paul Sarlo [D] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] |
Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A2740 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-19 | Assembly | Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (63-10-0) |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Substituted for A2740 (1R) |
2016-01-07 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-0) |
2015-12-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2015-11-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2740 (Same As) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by S3244 (1R)