NJ S3176 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.138.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.138.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Changes year used to calculate TDI and FLI employee taxes from most recent calendar year to most recent fiscal year.
Title
Changes year used to calculate TDI and FLI employee taxes from most recent calendar year to most recent fiscal year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4898 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-21 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2017, c.138. |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-0) |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Substituted for A4898 |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4898 (Same As) 2017-06-22 - Substituted by S3176