NJ S3172 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S358
Note: Carry Foward to future A3673
Note: Carry Foward to future A3673
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires public school instruction in mental health as it relates to suicide prevention and provides various elements which may be included in instruction.*
Title
Requires public school instruction in mental health as it relates to suicide prevention and provides various elements which may be included in instruction.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (34-0) |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-11-26 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3172 (Carry Over) 2019-03-18 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S3172 (Carry Over) 2019-03-18 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A4756 (Same As) 2018-12-06 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S3172 (Carry Over) 2019-03-18 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A4756 (Same As) 2018-12-06 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee