NJ S3170 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.423.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Increases prenotification time and requires severance pay in certain plant closings, transfers, and mass layoffs.**

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increases prenotification time and requires severance pay in certain plant closings, transfers, and mass layoffs.**

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5145 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 21 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-21SenateApproved P.L.2019, c.423.
2020-01-13SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (29-0)
2020-01-13SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2020-01-13AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (55-21-0)
2020-01-13AssemblySubstituted for A5145 (2R)
2020-01-13AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Milam)
2020-01-06AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2019-12-16SenatePassed by the Senate (27-13)
2019-12-05SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-02-07SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2019-02-07SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-01-15SenateTransferred to Senate Commerce Committee
2018-11-26SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee

Same As/Similar To

A5145 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S3170 (3R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback