NJ A5145 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S3170 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Increases prenotification time and requires severance pay in certain plant closings, transfers, and mass layoffs.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increases prenotification time and requires severance pay in certain plant closings, transfers, and mass layoffs.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-12-09 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-13AssemblySubstituted by S3170 (3R)
2019-12-16AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Sumter)
2019-12-09AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-03-05AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3170 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (29-0)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback