NJ S3160 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.224.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.224.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes pilot program in DOE to provide later school start times for high school students.
Title
Establishes pilot program in DOE to provide later school start times for high school students.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Codey [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] |
Rep. Patricia Jones [D] | Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] | Sen. John McKeon [D] | Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4865 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.224. |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (72-0-3) |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Substituted for A4865 |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-0) |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-11-26 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4865 (Same As) 2019-06-27 - Substituted by S3160