NJ A4865 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Substituted by S3160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes pilot program in DOE to provide later school start times for high school students.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes pilot program in DOE to provide later school start times for high school students.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-27AssemblySubstituted by S3160
2019-06-10AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-01-15AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3160 (Same As) 2019-08-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.224.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback