NJ S3121 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3959
Note: Carry Over of previous S2935
Note: Carry Over of previous S2935
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain local authorities to inspect, maintain, and repair fire hydrants in planned real estate developments.
Title
Requires certain local authorities to inspect, maintain, and repair fire hydrants in planned real estate developments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2480 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Women's Affairs Committee
A3959 (Carry Over) 2022-05-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee
S2935 (Carry Over) 2022-06-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A3959 (Carry Over) 2022-05-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee
S2935 (Carry Over) 2022-06-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S3121 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S3500/3121_I1.HTM |