NJ A3959 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future A2480
Note: Carry Foward to future S3121
Note: Carry Over of previous A3618
Note: Carry Over of previous S494

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires certain local authorities to inspect, maintain, and repair fire hydrants in planned real estate developments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires certain local authorities to inspect, maintain, and repair fire hydrants in planned real estate developments.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-12AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3959 (Carry Over) 2022-05-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee
A3959 (Carry Over) 2022-05-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee
A3618 (Carry Over) 2020-03-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee
S494 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S2935 (Same As) 2022-06-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback