NJ S3108 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2442
Note: Carry Foward to future S2529
Note: Carry Over of previous A4596
Note: Carry Over of previous S2828
Note: Carry Foward to future S2529
Note: Carry Over of previous A4596
Note: Carry Over of previous S2828
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 29 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-29 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 29 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-29 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DOE to develop credential to introduce teachers to culturally responsive teaching practices, characteristics, and methods.
Title
Requires DOE to develop credential to introduce teachers to culturally responsive teaching practices, characteristics, and methods.
Sponsors
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-29 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3108 (Carry Over) 2022-09-29 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S3108 (Carry Over) 2022-09-29 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A1690 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A4596 (Carry Over) 2020-08-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S2828 (Carry Over) 2020-08-17 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S3108 (Carry Over) 2022-09-29 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A1690 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A4596 (Carry Over) 2020-08-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S2828 (Carry Over) 2020-08-17 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S3108 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S3500/3108_I1.HTM |