NJ S3036 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S817
Note: Carry Foward to future A2232
Note: Carry Over of previous A5270
Note: Carry Foward to future A2232
Note: Carry Over of previous A5270
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.416.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.416.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits medical providers from reporting certain workers' compensation medical charges to collection and credit reporting agencies.
Title
Prohibits medical providers from reporting certain workers' compensation medical charges to collection and credit reporting agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1697 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.416. |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-0) |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted for A1697 (1R) |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-1) |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3036 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.416.
S3036 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.416.
A1697 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S3036 (2R)
A5270 (Carry Over) 2017-12-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
S3036 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.416.
A1697 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S3036 (2R)
A5270 (Carry Over) 2017-12-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee