NJ S3033 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-01 - Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-01 - Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes School and Small Business Energy Efficiency Stimulus Program in BPU.
Title
Establishes School and Small Business Energy Efficiency Stimulus Program in BPU.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4819 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4819 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-3-0) |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Substituted for A4819 (2R) |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-03-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-15 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee |
2021-02-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (25-9) |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-10-19 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4819 (Same As) 2021-05-20 - Substituted by S3033 (3R)