NJ A4819 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Introduced on October 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-20 - Substituted by S3033 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-20 - Substituted by S3033 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes School and Small Business Energy Efficiency Stimulus Program in BPU.
Title
Establishes School and Small Business Energy Efficiency Stimulus Program in BPU.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Substituted by S3033 (3R) |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-03-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-15 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee |
2021-02-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-10-19 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3033 (Same As) 2021-06-01 - Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence