NJ S3020 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-08-13 - Substituted by A4333 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-08-13 - Substituted by A4333 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts certain activities of alarm businesses from statutes governing practice of locksmithing.
Title
Exempts certain activities of alarm businesses from statutes governing practice of locksmithing.
Sponsors
Sen. Nia Gill [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-07-20 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-13 | Senate | Substituted by A4333 (1R) |
2015-07-23 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4333 (Same As) 2015-11-09 - Approved P.L.2015, c.154.