NJ S3013 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on January 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - Approved P.L.2023, c.217.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on January 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - Approved P.L.2023, c.217.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revises definition of women's business enterprise and minority business enterprise.
Title
Revises definition of women's business enterprise and minority business enterprise.
Sponsors
Sen. Nicholas Scutari [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Sen. Edward Durr [R] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-12-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5062 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5062 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | Senate | Approved P.L.2023, c.217. |
2023-12-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (34-0) |
2023-11-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2023-06-30 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-2-0) |
2023-06-30 | Assembly | Substituted for A5062 (1R) |
2023-06-28 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2023-06-28 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Budget Committee |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2023-02-27 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-09-22 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5062 (Same As) 2023-06-30 - Substituted by S3013 (1R)