NJ S291 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-3)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.117.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes health care providers to engage in telemedicine and telehealth.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes health care providers to engage in telemedicine and telehealth.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A1464 Acs (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Senate Substitute (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-03 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-26 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-21AssemblyApproved P.L.2017, c.117.
2017-06-22AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (73-0-0)
2017-06-22AssemblySubstituted for A1464 (ACS/1R)
2017-06-22AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2017-06-22SenatePassed by the Senate (38-0)
2017-06-19SenateSenate Substitution (31-0) (Vitale)
2016-11-03SenateReported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2016-09-26SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2016-09-26SenateReported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2016-01-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2729 (Carry Over) 2015-02-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A1464 (Same As) 2017-06-22 - Substituted by S291/652/1954 (SS)
A4231 (Carry Over) 2015-02-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback