NJ A1464 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Substituted by S291/652/1954 (SS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes health care providers to engage in telemedicine and teleheath. *

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes health care providers to engage in telemedicine and teleheath. *

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-22AssemblySubstituted by S291/652/1954 (SS)
2017-06-19AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2017-06-12AssemblyReported as an Assembly Committee Substitute and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2016-03-18AssemblyReviewed by the Pension and Health Benefits Commission Recommend to not enact
2016-01-27AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4231 (Carry Over) 2015-02-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
S291 (Same As) 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.117.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback