NJ S2894 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-5)
Status: Passed on August 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-17 - Approved P.L.2011, c.98.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-5)
Status: Passed on August 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-17 - Approved P.L.2011, c.98.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates $8.831 million from "2009 Farmland Preservation Fund," "2007 Farmland Preservation Fund," and "Garden State Farmland Preservation Trust Fund" for grants to certain nonprofit organizations for farmland preservation purposes.
Title
Appropriates $8.831 million from "2009 Farmland Preservation Fund," "2007 Farmland Preservation Fund," and "Garden State Farmland Preservation Trust Fund" for grants to certain nonprofit organizations for farmland preservation purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-17 | Approved P.L.2011, c.98. | |
2011-06-23 | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (78-0-0) | |
2011-06-23 | Substituted for A4062 | |
2011-06-13 | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading | |
2011-06-09 | Passed by the Senate (37-0) | |
2011-06-06 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2011-05-19 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4062 (Same As) 2011-06-23 - Substituted by S2894