NJ A4062 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-23 - Substituted by S2894
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-23 - Substituted by S2894
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates $8.831 million from "2009 Farmland Preservation Fund," "2007 Farmland Preservation Fund," and "Garden State Farmland Preservation Trust Fund" for grants to certain nonprofit organizations for farmland preservation purposes.
Title
Appropriates $8.831 million from "2009 Farmland Preservation Fund," "2007 Farmland Preservation Fund," and "Garden State Farmland Preservation Trust Fund" for grants to certain nonprofit organizations for farmland preservation purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-23 | Substituted by S2894 | |
2011-06-13 | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2011-05-23 | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee | |
2011-05-19 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2894 (Same As) 2011-08-17 - Approved P.L.2011, c.98.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2010/A4062 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/A4500/4062_I1.HTM |