NJ S2887 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A1315
Note: Carry Over of previous S1548
Note: Carry Over of previous S1548
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides certain volunteer and other workers with maximum compensation benefit for workers' compensation claim regardless of outside employment.
Title
Provides certain volunteer and other workers with maximum compensation benefit for workers' compensation claim regardless of outside employment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2771 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
A1315 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
S1548 (Carry Over) 2022-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
A1315 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
S1548 (Carry Over) 2022-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S2887 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S3000/2887_I1.HTM |