NJ S288 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S993
Note: Carry Foward to future A3966
Note: Carry Over of previous S3741
Note: Carry Over of previous A5973
Note: Carry Foward to future A3966
Note: Carry Over of previous S3741
Note: Carry Over of previous A5973
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-27 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-27 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for DCA to reestablish and administer certification program for recreation administrators and automatically reinstate administrator certifications issued under prior law.
Title
Provides for DCA to reestablish and administer certification program for recreation administrators and automatically reinstate administrator certifications issued under prior law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-10-27 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2022-10-27 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S288 (Carry Over) 2022-10-27 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S288 (Carry Over) 2022-10-27 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S3741 (Carry Over) 2021-12-09 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A5973 (Carry Over) 2021-11-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
S288 (Carry Over) 2022-10-27 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S3741 (Carry Over) 2021-12-09 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A5973 (Carry Over) 2021-11-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee