NJ S2854 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on December 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - Substituted by A4401 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - Substituted by A4401 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes certain benefits for certain family members of military personnel who died while on active duty.
Title
Authorizes certain benefits for certain family members of military personnel who died while on active duty.
Sponsors
Sen. James Beach [D] | Sen. Fred Madden [D] | Sen. Nilsa Cruz-Perez [D] | Sen. Jeff Van Drew [D] |
Sen. Jennifer Beck [R] | Sen. Anthony R. Bucco [R] | Sen. Robert Gordon [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-19 | Senate | Substituted by A4401 (2R) |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-12-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4401 (Same As) 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.175.