NJ S2852 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on July 23 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-10-29 - Substituted by A4339 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires school bus operations in State to comply with certain federal regulations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires school bus operations in State to comply with certain federal regulations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-26 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-29SenateSubstituted by A4339 (1R)
2018-09-27SenateSenate Amendment (36-0) (Diegnan)
2018-07-26SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-07-23SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4339 (Same As) 2018-10-29 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback